TX HB2872 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the collection, remittance, and administration of certain taxes on motor vehicles rented through a marketplace rental provider.
Title
Relating to the collection, remittance, and administration of certain taxes on motor vehicles rented through a marketplace rental provider.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1141 (Y: 127 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1141 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-23 | House | Postponed |
2019-04-23 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1), Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2), and Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5) |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1578 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Electronic Information Systems
RENTAL CARS
Taxation
Taxation--General
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Business & Commerce--General
Electronic Information Systems
RENTAL CARS
Taxation
Taxation--General
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General