TX HB288 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the personal needs allowance for certain Medicaid recipients who are residents of long-term care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the personal needs allowance for certain Medicaid recipients who are residents of long-term care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1295 (Y: 98 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1249 (Y: 122 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-16SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1295
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1249
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback