TX HB2881 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing resource campuses to improve a public school campus not performing satisfactorily.
Title
Relating to establishing resource campuses to improve a public school campus not performing satisfactorily.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers