TX HB2890 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the terminology used to refer to an individualized education program team.
Title
Relating to the terminology used to refer to an individualized education program team.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-05-10 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--School Districts
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--School Districts
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2890 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02890I.htm |