TX HB2906 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to orders of nondisclosure for certain victims of trafficking of persons.
Title
Relating to orders of nondisclosure for certain victims of trafficking of persons.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] |
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-23 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
HUMAN TRAFFICKING