TX HB2919 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a demonstration program at the State Office of Risk Management for real-time processing of workers' compensation authorizations of payment for medical services and medical bills.
Title
Relating to a demonstration program at the State Office of Risk Management for real-time processing of workers' compensation authorizations of payment for medical services and medical bills.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |