TX HB2928 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to jurisdiction of contested probate proceedings in counties without a statutory probate court or county court at law exercising original probate jurisdiction.
Title
Relating to jurisdiction of contested probate proceedings in counties without a statutory probate court or county court at law exercising original probate jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |