TX HB2941 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs & Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs & Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring each state agency to post on the agency's Internet website information on suicide prevention.
Title
Relating to requiring each state agency to post on the agency's Internet website information on suicide prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#320 |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
INTERNET
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Military & Veterans
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
SUICIDE
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Military & Veterans
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
SUICIDE