TX HB2959 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain counties to impose a hotel occupancy tax.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain counties to impose a hotel occupancy tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-05-10 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (contested) |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-05-03 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2959 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02959I.htm |