TX HB2973 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a defendant's payment of costs associated with a court-appointed counsel.
Title
Relating to a defendant's payment of costs associated with a court-appointed counsel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4605 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2973 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02973I.htm |