TX HB2991 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of disciplinary alternatives to suspension by a school district and the creation of the restorative justice coordinating council.
Title
Relating to the use of disciplinary alternatives to suspension by a school district and the creation of the restorative justice coordinating council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--School Districts
RESTORATIVE JUSTICE COORDINATING COUNCIL
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--School Districts
RESTORATIVE JUSTICE COORDINATING COUNCIL