TX HB2995 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1852 (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House discharges conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | House discharges conferees |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-21 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-21 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-21 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Finance
Health Care Providers
SAM RAYBURN RESERVOIR
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Taxation
Taxation--General
County Government--Finance
Health Care Providers
SAM RAYBURN RESERVOIR
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Taxation
Taxation--General