TX HB3009 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to civics instruction in public schools.
Title
Relating to civics instruction in public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. James Talarico [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] |
Rep. Christina Morales [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#995 (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#995 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 1-Krause, Cain, and Toth |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts