TX HB3015 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to educational programs provided by the Windham School District in the Texas Department of Criminal Justice for certain inmates.
Title
Relating to educational programs provided by the Windham School District in the Texas Department of Criminal Justice for certain inmates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
WINDHAM SCHOOL DISTRICT
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
WINDHAM SCHOOL DISTRICT