TX HB3042 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas college work-study program and to establishing a program for the off-campus employment of certain students at public or private institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the Texas college work-study program and to establishing a program for the off-campus employment of certain students at public or private institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#578 (Y: 84 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#552 (Y: 85 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#552 (Y: 85 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#578 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#552 |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Wages
Labor--Workforce Development
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Wages
Labor--Workforce Development