TX HB305 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the requirement that certain political subdivisions with authority to impose a tax post certain information on an Internet website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the requirement that certain political subdivisions with authority to impose a tax post certain information on an Internet website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1771 (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#75 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Amended RV#67 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1771
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-27SenateRead first time
2019-03-25SenateReceived from the House
2019-03-21HouseReported engrossed
2019-03-21HouseRecord vote RV#75
2019-03-21HousePassed
2019-03-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20HouseRecord vote RV#67
2019-03-20HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-03-20HouseAmended 1-Springer, K. King, Murr, and Leman
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB305
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00305I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00305H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00305E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00305S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00305F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB305&RcdVtNo=67&Ch=H&Dt=03/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB305&RcdVtNo=75&Ch=H&Dt=03/21/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB305&RcdVtNo=1771&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2019

Bill Comments

feedback