TX HB3069 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a grant program for promoting computer science certification and professional development in coding, technology applications, and computer science for public school teachers.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a grant program for promoting computer science certification and professional development in coding, technology applications, and computer science for public school teachers.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] |
Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1113 (Y: 109 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1113 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Science & Technology
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Science & Technology