TX HB3071 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-09 - Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-09 - Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to contract award considerations by certain conservation and reclamation districts.
Title
Relating to contract award considerations by certain conservation and reclamation districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Veasey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-04 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-04 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility