TX HB311 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a sales and use tax exemption for certain feminine hygiene products.
Title
Relating to a sales and use tax exemption for certain feminine hygiene products.
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] |
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB146 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB311 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00311I.htm |