TX HB3114 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to contested case hearings on matters under the jurisdiction of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Title
Relating to contested case hearings on matters under the jurisdiction of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Judges
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
Courts--Judges
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure