TX HB3118 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the titling of certain off-highway vehicles purchased outside this state.
Title
Relating to the titling of certain off-highway vehicles purchased outside this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#904 (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#859 (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#859 (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#904 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | House | Record vote RV#859 |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Taxation
Taxation--General
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Taxation
Taxation--General
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration