TX HB3120 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for certain felony offenses committed by an inmate released on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Title
Relating to the punishment for certain felony offenses committed by an inmate released on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
RECIDIVISM & REPEAT OFFENDERS
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
RECIDIVISM & REPEAT OFFENDERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3120 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03120I.htm |