TX HB3121 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an interim study of suits affecting the parent-child relationship in cases involving abuse and other harmful conduct engaged in by a party.
Title
Relating to an interim study of suits affecting the parent-child relationship in cases involving abuse and other harmful conduct engaged in by a party.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
CHILD CUSTODY
CONSERVATORSHIP
EVIDENCE
Family
Family--Child Protection
Family--Family Violence
Family--Parent & Child
Legislature
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL ABUSE
SEXUAL ASSAULT
CHILD CUSTODY
CONSERVATORSHIP
EVIDENCE
Family
Family--Child Protection
Family--Family Violence
Family--Parent & Child
Legislature
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL ABUSE
SEXUAL ASSAULT