TX HB3132 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to staff development requirements for public school teachers who provide reading instruction to students in kindergarten through grade three.
Title
Relating to staff development requirements for public school teachers who provide reading instruction to students in kindergarten through grade three.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#981 (Y: 118 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#981 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING