TX HB3135 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to affirmative defenses to prosecution for certain offenses involving material or conduct that is obscene or otherwise harmful to children.
Title
Relating to affirmative defenses to prosecution for certain offenses involving material or conduct that is obscene or otherwise harmful to children.
Sponsors
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Mike Lang [R] |
Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Rep. William Zedler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |