TX HB3158 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-13 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-13 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Medicaid managed care pilot programs for contracts with provider-directed managed care organizations, including organizations that delegate to health care collaboratives, and to the establishment of those collaboratives.
Title
Relating to Medicaid managed care pilot programs for contracts with provider-directed managed care organizations, including organizations that delegate to health care collaboratives, and to the establishment of those collaboratives.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-04 - House - HB 3158Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-04 | House | Passed |
2013-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-02 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2013-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF