TX HB3158 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the retirement systems for and the provision of other benefits to police and fire fighters in certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the retirement systems for and the provision of other benefits to police and fire fighters in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1839 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Amended RV#794 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amended RV#707 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Amended RV#794 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amended RV#707 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | See remarks for effective date | |
2017-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD
City Government--Employees/Officers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD