TX HB3162 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prepaid funeral benefits.
Title
Relating to prepaid funeral benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#310 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#310 |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1822 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
BANKING, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
FUNERALS & FUNERAL DIRECTORS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
FUNERALS & FUNERAL DIRECTORS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions