TX HB317 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of clinical decision support software and laboratory benefits management programs in connection with the provision of clinical laboratory services to certain managed care plan enrollees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of clinical decision support software and laboratory benefits management programs in connection with the provision of clinical laboratory services to certain managed care plan enrollees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-02HouseWithdrawn from schedule
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback