TX HB3172 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 69-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the protection of membership in and support to religious organizations.
Title
Relating to the protection of membership in and support to religious organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Returned to committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Point of order sustained Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5) |
2019-05-09 | House | Point of order overruled Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1978 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
Religion
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
Religion
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees