TX HB3195 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to juveniles committed to the Texas Juvenile Justice Department and the transition of students from alternative education programs to regular classrooms.
Title
Relating to juveniles committed to the Texas Juvenile Justice Department and the transition of students from alternative education programs to regular classrooms.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. James White [R] |
Sen. John Whitmire [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1841 (Y: 102 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 105 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 105 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1841 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#735 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |