TX HB3233 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Judicial Campaign Fairness Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Judicial Campaign Fairness Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#980 (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-02 Effective immediately
2019-06-02 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#980
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Elections
2019-03-13HouseRead first time
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback