TX HB3271 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the removal of certain alcoholic beverages that become unfit for consumption after a natural disaster.
Title
Relating to the removal of certain alcoholic beverages that become unfit for consumption after a natural disaster.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1210 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3271 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03271I.htm |