TX HB3272 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a right of first refusal applicable to the sale of housing developments that have received certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Relating to a right of first refusal applicable to the sale of housing developments that have received certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | No action taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB864 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Subjects
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3272 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03272I.htm |