TX HB3283 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the release of certain defendants on bail.
Title
Relating to the release of certain defendants on bail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-05 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure