TX HB3290 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the adoption of special threat response policies by school districts and special threat response policies and protocols by law enforcement agencies with jurisdiction in school districts and of standard terminology for special threat response by the Texas Education Agency.
Title
Relating to the adoption of special threat response policies by school districts and special threat response policies and protocols by law enforcement agencies with jurisdiction in school districts and of standard terminology for special threat response by the Texas Education Agency.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Safety
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Safety