TX HB3299 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of mediation requirements for balance billing to certain health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to the applicability of mediation requirements for balance billing to certain health benefit plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1530 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Health Care Providers
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3299 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03299I.htm |