TX HB3300 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Referred to Public Health
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Referred to Public Health
Summary
Relating to the use of electronic prescribing data transmission systems under the state Medicaid program.
Title
Relating to the use of electronic prescribing data transmission systems under the state Medicaid program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-24 | Correction in referral | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB287 (Same As) 2009-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS