TX HB333 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an optional county fee on vehicle registration to be used by a regional mobility authority.
Title
Relating to an optional county fee on vehicle registration to be used by a regional mobility authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#545 (Y: 100 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Amended RV#542 (Y: 104 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Amended RV#542 (Y: 104 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#545 |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#542 |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-18 | House | Amended 1-Canales |
2019-04-18 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-16 | House | Postponed 4/18/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-16 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-16 | House | Postponed 4/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR27 (Enabling for) 2019-03-06 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
DIMMIT COUNTY
FRIO COUNTY
KINNEY COUNTY
MAVERICK COUNTY
MIDDLE RIO GRANDE REGIONAL MOBILITY AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
UVALDE COUNTY
VAL VERDE COUNTY
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
ZAVALA COUNTY
County Government--General
DIMMIT COUNTY
FRIO COUNTY
KINNEY COUNTY
MAVERICK COUNTY
MIDDLE RIO GRANDE REGIONAL MOBILITY AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
UVALDE COUNTY
VAL VERDE COUNTY
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
ZAVALA COUNTY