TX HB3362 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the consideration of ownership interests of certain persons with a disability in determining whether a business is a historically underutilized business for purposes of state contracting.
Title
Relating to the consideration of ownership interests of certain persons with a disability in determining whether a business is a historically underutilized business for purposes of state contracting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Disabilities, Persons with
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
Military & Veterans
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Disabilities, Persons with
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
Military & Veterans
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions