TX HB337 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of emergency engine cutoff switches on motorboats; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of emergency engine cutoff switches on motorboats; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1703 (Y: 115 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#89 (Y: 115 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#80 (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Amendment tabled RV#79 (Y: 123 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-22HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1703
2019-05-22HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-14HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenatePassed
2019-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenateAmended
2019-05-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Campbell
2019-05-14SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-25SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-04-01SenateRead first time
2019-03-27SenateReceived from the House
2019-03-26HouseReported engrossed
2019-03-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-03-26HouseRecord vote RV#89
2019-03-26HousePassed
2019-03-26HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-03-25HouseRecord vote RV#80
2019-03-25HousePassed to engrossment
2019-03-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-03-25HouseRecord vote RV#79
2019-03-25HouseAmendment tabled 1-Stickland
2019-03-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB210 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB337
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00337I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00337S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00337F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB337&RcdVtNo=79&Ch=H&Dt=03/25/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB337&RcdVtNo=80&Ch=H&Dt=03/25/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB337&RcdVtNo=89&Ch=H&Dt=03/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-14-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-14-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB337&RcdVtNo=1703&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2019

Bill Comments

feedback