TX HB3376 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to forms of notice that may be provided by the Department of Public Safety during certain enforcement proceedings and actions.
Title
Relating to forms of notice that may be provided by the Department of Public Safety during certain enforcement proceedings and actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1060 (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1060 (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Insurance
Insurance--General
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Insurance
Insurance--General
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses