TX HB3376 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the review of ballot proposition language for certain political subdivision elections.
Title
Relating to the review of ballot proposition language for certain political subdivision elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Elections |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB323 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3376 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03376I.htm |