TX HB339 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the placement of speed limit signs at the end of construction or maintenance work zones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the placement of speed limit signs at the end of construction or maintenance work zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#76 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-03-27SenateRead first time
2019-03-25SenateReceived from the House
2019-03-21HouseReported engrossed
2019-03-21HouseRecord vote RV#76
2019-03-21HousePassed
2019-03-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-20HousePassed to engrossment
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback