TX HB3390 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to caregivers for certain children, including the identification of caregivers for children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services and an exception from licensing requirements for certain caretakers.
Title
Relating to caregivers for certain children, including the identification of caregivers for children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services and an exception from licensing requirements for certain caretakers.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] |
Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1890 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Amended RV#1318 (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Amended RV#1318 (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1890 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1318 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-10 | House | Amended 2-Klick |
2019-05-10 | House | Amended 1-Sanford |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-09 | House | Amended 1-Klick |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONSERVATORSHIP
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
VOLUNTEERS
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
VOLUNTEERS