TX HB3428 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training on Alzheimer's disease and dementia for certain Department of Family and Protective Services employees and area agencies on aging employees and volunteers.
Title
Relating to training on Alzheimer's disease and dementia for certain Department of Family and Protective Services employees and area agencies on aging employees and volunteers.
Sponsors
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICES DIV, FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES
Aging
ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Human Services
Human Services--General
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Aging
ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Human Services
Human Services--General
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING