TX HB3439 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 60-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Postponed 10/4/19 3:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Postponed 10/4/19 3:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a municipality or county to require a labor peace agreement as a condition of engaging in a commercial transaction with the municipality or county.
Title
Relating to the authority of a municipality or county to require a labor peace agreement as a condition of engaging in a commercial transaction with the municipality or county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Postponed 10/4/19 3:00 AM |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-08 | House | Postponed 5/8/19 4:00 PM |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-08 | House | Postponed 5/8/19 3:30 PM |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1634 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local