TX HB3447 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the content of detailed reports filed by lobbyists and to monetary limits on expenditures by lobbyists.
Title
Relating to the content of detailed reports filed by lobbyists and to monetary limits on expenditures by lobbyists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB366 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3447 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03447I.htm |