TX HB345 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 24 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on November 24 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to a business's duty to protect sensitive personal information contained in its customer records.
Title
Relating to a business's duty to protect sensitive personal information contained in its customer records.
Sponsors
Rep. Leo Berman [R] | Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] | Rep. Gary Elkins [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-17 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-09 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to subcommittee | |
2009-03-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-11-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB327 (Same As) 2009-02-17 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Financial
Financial--General
Protection of Personal Information
Business & Commerce--General
Financial
Financial--General
Protection of Personal Information