TX HB3453 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to subpoenas, orders, and warrants for the disclosure of location information, electronic customer communications records, and electronic customer data and for the use of pen registers, ESN readers, cell site simulators, and mobile tracking devices; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to subpoenas, orders, and warrants for the disclosure of location information, electronic customer communications records, and electronic customer data and for the use of pen registers, ESN readers, cell site simulators, and mobile tracking devices; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2093 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Law Enforcement
SEARCH WARRANTS
SUBPOENAS
Criminal Procedure--General
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Law Enforcement
SEARCH WARRANTS
SUBPOENAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3453 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03453I.htm |